Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Logan

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1784¹Born
27 May 180925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
24 Aug 182440.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meath, Ireland
24 Aug 182440.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
28 Oct 182440.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tremithus
11 Jan 182743.0SucceededBishop of Meath, Ireland
22 Apr 183046.3DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Logan (VIAF: 315640742)
Bishop Robert Logan (born 1784, died ) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBakan near Navan, Co. Meath
Ordained BishopDuleek
Death PlaceCobh, Co. Cork
Buried Place (Original)Chapel, Kells

  • a priest for 20.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 264, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 74
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast