Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Torello Romolo Pierazzi

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1794BornSan Miniato
20 Sep 181722.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 183439.5AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
30 Jun 183439.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
31 Jan 185156.1DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Torello Romolo Pierazzi (VIAF: 89324048)
Bishop Torello Romolo Pierazzi (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1834, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016