Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Picco

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vercelli

Titular Bishop of Anaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1896BornArigliano
10 Jul 192124.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 196265.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vercelli, Italy
15 Nov 196265.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Anaea
16 Dec 196266.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anaea
5 Nov 196770.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Vercelli, Italy
14 Aug 198487.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Picco:
Bishop Giovanni Picco (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vercelli

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013