Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Perchiacca

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1777³Born
4 Apr 180124.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 183254.9SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
2 Jul 183255.2ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
8 Jul 183255.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
27 Jul 183255.3InstalledBishop of Trivento, Italy
26 Nov 183659.6DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Perchiacca
Bishop Antonio Perchiacca (born , died ) Bishop of Trivento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapua

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018