Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Pecci

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1630BornSienna
3 May 167948.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 167949.2AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
10 Dec 167949.3Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
Oct 1694³64.1DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Pecci:
Bishop Paolo Pecci (born , died Oct 1694) Bishop of Massa Marittima

  • a priest for 15.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1679, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015