Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giustino Giulio Pastorino, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Benghazi, Libya

Titular Bishop of Babra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1910Born
26 May 193423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Jan 196554.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Benghazi, Libya
11 Jan 196554.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Babra
21 Mar 196554.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Babra
1966²55.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Derna, Libya
1978²67.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Derna, Libya
10 Mar 199786.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of Benghazi, Libya
26 Apr 200594.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Benghazi, Libya

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giustino Giulio Pastorino
Bishop Giustino Giulio Pastorino O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Benghazi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMasone, Italy

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ab: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1967, Page 754
  • aadm: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1978, Page 889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast