Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Moya Arjona

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹Born
28 Oct 163065.8SelectedBishop of Tuy, Spain
10 Feb 163166.1ConfirmedBishop of Tuy, Spain
14 Oct 163166.7DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Moya Arjona
Bishop Pedro Moya Arjona (born 1565, died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcalá la Real

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,841
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,891
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 154, Number 976
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,631, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast