Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Baldassare Mormile, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1750BornNapoli
Jun 1805³55.4SelectedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
26 Jun 180555.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
30 Jun 180555.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
20 Mar 181868.2SelectedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
6 Apr 181868.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
26 Jul 182676.6DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baldassare Mormile:
Archbishop Baldassare Mormile C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 105, and Page 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013