Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Ignace-Jean-Baptiste de Mesgrigny, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1653BornAix en Provence
24 May 167219.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Sep 168128.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Apr 171157.9SelectedBishop of Grasse, France
19 Oct 171158.5ConfirmedBishop of Grasse, France
20 Dec 171158.6Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
2 Mar 172672.8DiedBishop of Grasse, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Ignace-Jean-Baptiste de Mesgrigny:
Bishop Joseph-Ignace-Jean-Baptiste de Mesgrigny O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Grasse

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015