Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Melzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1590BornMilano
18 Feb 163645.1AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
24 Mar 163645.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Capua, Italy
20 Feb 164150.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
12 Jul 164352.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
2 Apr 164453.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
6 Sep 165261.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
9 Apr 165766.3Elevated to Cardinal
23 Apr 165766.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
21 Jan 165968.1DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Melzi (VIAF: 89105529)
Camillo Cardinal Melzi (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Apr 1657
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 134
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 96, Number 580
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1636, Number 4
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 273
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Nov 2016