Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Filippo Bascapé (Bescapé)

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 May 1657AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
24 Jun 1657Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
13 Aug 1662DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Filippo Bascapé (Bescapé)
Bishop Giacomo Filippo Bascapé (Bescapé) (died ) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodi, Diocese of Lodi
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph Chapel, Cathedral, Ascoli Satriano, Diocese of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia)

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 96
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,657, Number 21
  • ob/c2: AT, 25 Oct 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast