Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Petagna

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹BornPartenio
15 Jan 165734.0AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
28 Jan 165734.1Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
12 Sep 167956.7DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Petagna:
Bishop Giuseppe Petagna (died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 119, Number 727
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013