Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joachim-François-Mamert de Conzié

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1738BornSan Martin du Mont
18 Jun 176931.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
21 Aug 176931.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
17 Sep 176931.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
18 Dec 177436.7SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
2 Mar 177536.9ResignedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
29 May 177537.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
8 May 179557.1DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Joachim-François-Mamert de Conzié:
Archbishop Joachim-François-Mamert de Conzié (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 106, and Page 422
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015