Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Marsiglia

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1879BornRiccia
21 Dec 190223.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 193151.8AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
5 Jul 193151.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
20 May 194868.8DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Marsiglia:
Archbishop Domenico Marsiglia (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013