Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Mantovano, O.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Bova, Italy

Titular Bishop of MeloŽ in Lycia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1822Born
3 Feb 184320.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of the Minims
8 Mar 184522.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Minims
17 May 184522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
15 Mar 188360.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bova, Italy
15 Mar 188360.7AppointedTitular Bishop of MeloŽ in Lycia
26 Mar 188360.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of MeloŽ in Lycia
3 May 188966.9ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Bova, Italy
11 Jul 189472.0DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Bova, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Mantovano
Bishop Giovanni Battista Mantovano O.M. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuscaldo, Archdiocese of Cosenza
Ordained BishopS. Andre delle Fratte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 155, and Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1883, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017