Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Lojali

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1894Born
22 Dec 192329.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 193843.9AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
2 Oct 193844.0Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
14 Mar 196671.5DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Lojali
Bishop Vincenzo Lojali (born , died ) Bishop of Amelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAttigliano

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018