Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Lironi

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1817Born
30 Mar 183922.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 184023.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188366.0AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
18 Mar 188366.0Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
30 May 188972.2DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Lironi (VIAF: 89159975)
Bishop Gaetano Lironi (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpoleto
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,883, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast