Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Calogero Licata

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi e Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1872BornAragona
19 Dec 189624.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
17 Dec 189725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
14 Apr 191643.5AppointedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
29 Jun 191643.7Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
25 Aug 192451.8DiedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Calogero Licata:
Bishop Calogero Licata (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi e Teano

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 27
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013