Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Friedrich von Lasser

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1708Born
19 Mar 173426.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
11 Jul 173426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
16 Sep 174840.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
16 Sep 174840.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
30 Nov 174840.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
14 Apr 176961.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Friedrich von Lasser
Bishop Johann Friedrich von Lasser (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 269, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast