Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Ignace von Franken-Siersdorf

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany), Germany

Titular Bishop of Samosata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1720Born
5 Mar 174221.5Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
17 Sep 176040.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany), Germany
17 Sep 176040.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata
21 Nov 176242.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samosata
21 May 177958.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany), Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Ignace von Franken-Siersdorf
Bishop Johann Ignace von Franken-Siersdorf (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHildesheim
Ordained BishopErfurt

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 366, and Page 455
  • obc2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,627

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast