Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Friedrich Karl von Ostein

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1689BornAmorbach
22 Apr 174353.7SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
3 May 174353.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 May 174353.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 174354.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
15 Sep 174354.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
7 Oct 174859.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Worms, Germany
20 Jan 174959.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Worms, Germany
18 Jan 175666.5SucceededBishop of Worms, Germany
4 Jun 176373.9DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Friedrich Karl von Ostein:
Archbishop Johann Friedrich Karl von Ostein (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 292, and Page 447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015