Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Egidio Luigi Lanzo, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1885BornCaraglio
18 Sep 190924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Aug 194055.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto, Italy
9 Aug 194055.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
22 Sep 194055.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
22 Jan 194357.6AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
18 Apr 194357.8InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
29 Jan 197387.6DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egidio Luigi Lanzo:
Bishop Egidio Luigi Lanzo O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013