Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon de La Lane

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornBordeaux
1684¹42.0SelectedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
1 Nov 168846.8SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
10 Mar 169250.1ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
24 Aug 169250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
6 Aug 170058.5DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léon de La Lane:
Bishop Léon de La Lane (born 1642, died ) Bishop of Bayonne

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 93, and Page 112
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015