Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Lacy

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Aug 1737SelectedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
30 Aug 1737ConfirmedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
23 Feb 1738Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
4 Aug 1759DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Robert Lacy
Bishop Robert Lacy (died ) Bishop of Limerick

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 262
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast