Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Jakob Kraft

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1806BornOchtendung
28 May 183125.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
7 Apr 183226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
24 Sep 186862.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
24 Sep 186862.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
22 Nov 186862.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
9 Jun 188478.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Jakob Kraft:
Bishop Johann Jakob Kraft (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013