Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Friedrich Adolf von Hörde zu Schönholthausen

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

Titular Bishop of Flavias

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1688BornSchönholthausen
14 Mar 171425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
15 Dec 172234.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
15 Mar 172334.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
15 Mar 172334.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
29 Jun 172334.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
3 Aug 176172.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Friedrich Adolf von Hörde zu Schönholthausen:
Bishop Johann Friedrich Adolf von Hörde zu Schönholthausen (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 202
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015