Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johann Theodor Cardinal von Bayern

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Bishop of Freising

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1703BornMünich
29 Jul 171915.9SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
14 Oct 172118.1ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
5 Nov 172320.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Freising, Germany
12 Apr 172622.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Freising, Germany
23 Feb 172723.4SucceededBishop of Freising, Germany
8 Apr 173026.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 173027.0Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
9 Sep 174340.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
23 Jan 174440.3SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
12 Feb 174440.4ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
17 Jan 174642.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 Apr 174642.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
12 Feb 175955.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
13 Jul 176157.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
27 Jan 176359.3DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Theodor von Bayern:
Johann Theodor Cardinal von Bayern (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
  • a cardinal for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015