Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Meinwerk Kaup, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Callinicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1691BornGeske
171018.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Mar 171422.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Dec 171726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Sep 173342.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
2 Sep 173342.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
1 Nov 173342.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum
24 Jul 174554.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Meinwerk Kaup:
Bishop Meinwerk Kaup O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 141, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015