Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Winimar Knippschild, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Myndus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1679³BornMedebach
169717.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Jun 170223.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Dec 170425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Mar 172949.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
28 Mar 172949.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
16 Oct 172950.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
23 May 173253.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Winimar Knippschild:
Bishop Winimar Knippschild O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015