Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph von Hohenzollern-Hechingen

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1776³BornTroppau
24 Aug 180024.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
31 Aug 180024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
6 Jul 180832.1SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
14 Apr 181740.9ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
12 Jul 181842.1Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
26 Sep 183660.3DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph von Hohenzollern-Hechingen:
Bishop Joseph von Hohenzollern-Hechingen (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014