Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Halagi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1795¹Born
20 Feb 182530.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 185964.3AppointedBishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey
22 May 185964.3Ordained BishopBishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey
1878¹83.0ResignedBishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey
1883¹88.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Halagi
Bishop Antonio Halagi (born 1795, died 1883) Bishop Emeritus of Artuin degli Armeni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncira

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 124
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1859, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017