Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Gustíni-Zubrohlavský (Gusztinyi)

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1712BornZubrohlava
26 Apr 173421.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Apr 173522.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 176249.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia
22 Nov 176250.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia
22 Nov 176250.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sergiopolis
23 Jan 176350.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sergiopolis
29 Nov 176351.0SucceededBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
31 Jan 177764.2DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Gustíni-Zubrohlavský (Gusztinyi):
Bishop Ján Gustíni-Zubrohlavský (Gusztinyi) (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 312, and Page 377
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015