Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Gómez Polanco, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1753BornSan Sebastián de la Plata
11 May 181763.8SelectedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
28 Jul 181764.1ConfirmedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
21 Feb 181965.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
13 Dec 182067.4DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Gómez Polanco
Bishop Antonio Gómez Polanco O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 255
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016