Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pelayo González y Conde

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1828Born
1 Jun 189162.9AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
6 Sep 189163.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
18 Nov 189971.3DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pelayo González y Conde
Bishop Pelayo González y Conde (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillalcón, Diocese of León
Ordained BishopCathedral, Astorga, Diocese of Astorga

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017