Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Viktor Franz Anton von Glutz-Ruchti

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1747Born
177022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
181466.5IncardinatedPriest of Basel, Switzerland
29 May 182072.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
29 May 182072.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
27 Aug 182073.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
9 Oct 182477.3DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Viktor Franz Anton von Glutz-Ruchti
Bishop Viktor Franz Anton von Glutz-Ruchti (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolothurn

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 106, and Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018