Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Giannotti, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Modigliana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1824Born
16 Nov 184016.8ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
30 Nov 184622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
22 Dec 187147.9AppointedBishop of Modigliana, Italy
27 Dec 187147.9Ordained BishopBishop of Modigliana, Italy
17 Jul 189571.5DiedBishop of Modigliana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Giannotti (VIAF: 89649127)
Bishop Leonardo Giannotti O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Modigliana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorcigliano
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,871, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast