Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Gentilucci

Deceased

Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1842Born
15 Jun 186724.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188340.3AppointedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
18 Mar 188340.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
29 Nov 189553.0AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
14 Sep 190966.8DiedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Gentilucci
Bishop Luciano Gentilucci (born , died ) Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFabriano, Diocese of Fabriano e Matelica
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 267, and Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017