Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund French, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1775¹Born
1804²29.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 182449.6AppointedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
13 Mar 182550.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
14 Jul 185277.5DiedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund French
Bishop Edmund French O.P. (born 1775, died ) Bishop of Kilmacduagh

EventPlace
Ordained PriestLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceGort, Co. Galway

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 7
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 48, and Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Aug 2020

Quantcast