Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Forer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Memphis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1913Born
10 Jul 193824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
11 Feb 195642.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy
11 Feb 195642.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
8 Apr 195642.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Memphis
10 Feb 196147.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
1 Sep 196450.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy
2 Jan 198975.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
5 Oct 199783.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Forer (VIAF: 50067274)
Bishop Heinrich Forer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampo Tures, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
Ordained PriestCampo Tures, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
Ordained BishopChurch, Cortina d’Ampezzo

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 25
  • c1/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast