Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Fontana

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1871Born
22 Dec 189524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Dec 192251.8AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
21 Jan 192351.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
21 Dec 194170.9DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Fontana
Bishop Alessandro Fontana (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast