Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Fioravanti

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1755BornRome
18 Sep 177923.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 181458.9AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
9 Oct 181458.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
13 Jul 181862.7DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Fioravanti:
Bishop Carlo Fioravanti (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013