Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Filipponi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nard˛


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1789³BornPalermo
12 Jun 181324.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 184152.2SelectedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
27 Jan 184252.9ConfirmedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
24 Apr 184253.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
16 Aug 184556.5ResignedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
1851¹61.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Nard˛, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Filipponi
Bishop Angelo Filipponi (born , died 1851) Bishop Emeritus of Nard˛

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 281
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1842, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016