Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Fabian Fahey

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA

Titular Bishop of Ipsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1898Born
29 May 192627.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 194849.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA
13 Mar 194849.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ipsus
26 May 194849.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ipsus
31 Mar 195051.6DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Fabian Fahey
Bishop Leo Fabian Fahey (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Baker City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBay St. Louis, MS

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018