Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislao Eula

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1818Born
5 Jun 184122.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 187657.6AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
17 Apr 187657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
10 Apr 188667.8DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stanislao Eula (VIAF: 88946966)
Bishop Stanislao Eula (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondovi, Diocese of Mondovi
Ordained BishopSt Andre au Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 419
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,748
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017