Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul-Mounged El-Hachem

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Kuwait

Titular Archbishop of Darnis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1934 BornAkoura
28 Mar 195924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
10 Jun 199560.8AppointedBishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite), Lebanon
13 Sep 199561.0Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite), Lebanon
27 Aug 200571.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Darnis
27 Aug 200571.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kuwait
27 Aug 200571.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bahrain
27 Aug 200571.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Yemen
27 Aug 200571.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Qatar
4 Aug 200772.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to United Arab Emirates
2 Dec 200975.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Kuwait
2 Dec 200975.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Bahrain
2 Dec 200975.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Yemen
2 Dec 200975.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Qatar
2 Dec 200975.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to United Arab Emirates

MicroData Summary for Paul-Mounged El-Hachem:
Archbishop Paul-Mounged El-Hachem (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Kuwait

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Kuwait.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bu: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,608

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013