Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Barbato Pasca di Magliano

Deceased

Bishop of Alife, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1822Born
21 Dec 187452.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alife, Italy
21 Dec 187452.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
27 Dec 187452.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
1 Jul 187856.3SucceededBishop of Alife, Italy
8 Dec 187957.7DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Barbato Pasca di Magliano
Bishop Luigi Barbato Pasca di Magliano (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopTrinite des Monts, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 90, and Page 520
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017