Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Diamare

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1837Born
30 Mar 186123.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188547.9AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
7 Apr 188547.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
1 Jun 188851.1AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
9 Jan 191476.7DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Diamare (VIAF: 88822081)
Bishop Giovanni Maria Diamare (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSt Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 333, and Page 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017