Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paul Dempsey

Bishop-Elect of Achonry, Ireland

Titular See: (consecration postponed)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1971 Born
6 Jul 199726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
27 Jan 202048.7AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Paul Dempsey
Father Paul Dempsey (born ) Bishop-Elect of Achonry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarlow Town, Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin
Ordained PriestAssumption, Cathedral, Carlow, Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin
Ordained BishopAnnunciation & St. Nathy, Cathedral, Ballaghaderreen, Diocese of Achonry

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Achonry.

  • a priest for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2020
  • ob: CB, 27 Jan 2020
  • c2+: CB, 6 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast