Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Delogu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valva e Sulmona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1915BornBitti
16 Jun 194025.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 197257.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cagliari, Italy
15 Apr 197257.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cannae
11 Jun 197257.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cannae
2 Feb 197459.0AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
8 Jan 198166.0AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
25 May 198570.3ResignedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
13 Jun 200186.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Delogu:
Bishop Salvatore Delogu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valva e Sulmona

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015