Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Auguste Delalle

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1800Born
18 Dec 182424.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 185554.9SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
28 Sep 185554.9ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
18 Nov 185555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
6 Jun 187170.6DiedBishop of Rodez, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Auguste Delalle (VIAF: 79014691)
Bishop Louis-Auguste Delalle (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRevin, Diocese of Liège, Belgium
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nancy, Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 489
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016